This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 18:31:47 (UTC).

JUDY BAUMGARTNER VS SUZETTE JOHNSTON

Case Summary

On 07/02/2004 JUDY BAUMGARTNER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SUZETTE JOHNSTON. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAUMGARTNER, JUDY

Defendants

CORFANGNIA, MARK

JOHNSTON, SUZETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nadel, Russell J

Defendant Attorney

NAGLE, JOHN S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/08/2017

DocketCase File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2004

DocketDamages are $0.00.

08/13/2004

DocketJudgment entered against SUZETTE JOHNSTON, MARK CORFANGNIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2004

DocketJudgment entered on COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) of BAUMGARTNER for JUDY BAUMGARTNER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2004

DocketJudgment Ordered as follows:

08/13/2004

Docket(SIMI) COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. TIME ESTIMATE: 0 days 1:00 hours. Hearing: JUDGMENT ORDERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2004

DocketWrit of possession is to issue forthwith but no final lockout prior to 09/03/04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2004

DocketJudgment for possession of premises located at 81 N RANCHO RD THOUSAND OAKS CA. 91362

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2004

DocketJudgment entered on COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) of BAUMGARTNER against SUZETTE JOHNSTON, MARK CORFANGNIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2004

DocketJudgment entered on COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) of BAUMGARTNER for JUDY BAUMGARTNER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
07/09/2004

DocketAnswer (Limited Jurisdiction, Under $10,000) to COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) of BAUMGARTNER filed by SUZETTE JOHNSTON, MARK CORFANGNIA, represented by JOHN S. NAGLE Receipt Number: 407090329 for $142.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2004

DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Fees filed by MARK CORFANGNIA GRANTED in the amount of $152.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2004

DocketApplication for Waiver of Court fees and costs filed by MARK CORFANGNIA.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2004

DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer filing mailed to defendant(s) and all unnamed occupants.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2004

DocketCase Information Sheet filed. Type of trial requested: COURT. Estimated time: 1/2 HOUR. Mediation eligible NO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2004

DocketCase assigned to Courtroom S2

07/02/2004

Docket(M) Track assignment: Unlawful Detainer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2004

DocketDaily rental value $61.66; Address 81 N RANCHO RD THOUSAND OAKS CA. 91362; 5 day summons issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2004

DocketDeclaration re: Court Assignment filed

07/02/2004

Docket(M) Complaint filed (Unlawful Detainer) - prayer amount $10,000.00 or less Receipt Number: 407020215 for $130.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records