This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/22/2018 at 19:53:10 (UTC).

VAXGEN, INC. VS FIRSTENBER MACHINERY CO., ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2009 VAXGEN, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIRSTENBER MACHINERY CO . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Scott, Joseph C, Scott, Joseph C. and Dylina, Steven L.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse :

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Scott, Joseph C

Scott, Joseph C.

Dylina, Steven L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

VAXGEN, INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

FIRSTENBERG MACHINERY COMPANY,INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

KLINGSPORN, GREGORY K.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KEATING, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF VAXGEN INC. FILED BY FIRSTENBERG MACHINERY COMPANY, INC., REPRESENTED B Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF VAXGEN, INC. FILED BY FIRSTENBERG MACHINERY COMPANY, INC., REPRESENTED BY THOMAS KEATING

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judicial Officer Scott Joseph C Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Affidavit.

AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL DELIVERY BY R LOPEZ FILED Comment AFFI: AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL DELIVERY BY R LOPEZ FILED

Conversion Action.

(S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF FIRSTENBERG MACHINERY COMPANYINC. FILED Comment CC: (S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF FIRSTENBERG MACHINERY COMPANY,INC. FILED

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

05/11/2010

Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: VAXGEN INC.; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2010

Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: VAXGEN INC.; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2010

Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2010

Jury Trial. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2010

Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2010

Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 01:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2010

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2010

Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Comment SOADR: STIP AND ORDER TO ADR SIGNED BY ROBERT D. FOILES ON 03/03/10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2010

Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 100222-0109-CK 037/ 20.00 PAYMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2010

Stipulation & Order. Additional Info: Comment SO: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE FILING OF AMENDED PLEADINGS FILED BY VAXGEN INC..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
07/07/2009
View Court Documents

Affidavit. Additional Info: AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL DELIVERY BY R LOPEZ FILED Comment AFFI: AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL DELIVERY BY R LOPEZ FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2009
View Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2009
View Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2009

Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 090707-0130-CK 026/ 350.00 PAYMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2009
View Court Documents

Complaint. Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2010

Financial info for VAXGEN, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 201002220109 VAXGEN, INC. $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2010

Financial info for VAXGEN, INC. : Transaction Assessment $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2009

Financial info for VAXGEN, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 200907070130 VAXGEN, INC. $350.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2009

Financial info for VAXGEN, INC. : Transaction Assessment $350.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2009

Financial: VAXGEN, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records