This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/22/2018 at 05:30:22 (UTC).

PAUL LYNCH V STEELE A.SPENGLER,ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/01/2003 PAUL LYNCH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEELE A SPENGLER. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, SHWARTZ, JOHN, FREEMAN, BETH and KOPP, QUENTIN L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse :

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

SHWARTZ, JOHN

FREEMAN, BETH

KOPP, QUENTIN L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LYNCH, PAUL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

LUNDRY, WALLACE

SPENGLER, STEELE A.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SPENGLER, STEELE A.

Cross Defendants

THOMPSON, DAVID T.

LUNDRY, WALLACE

5TH AVENUE REAL ESTATE

ALESSIO, LAWRENCE R.

DAVID T. THOMPSON DBA WAYS & MEANS REAL ESTATE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, PATRICK TALBOT

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

ALESSIO, LAWRENCE R

LLOYD, DEAN

CONRAD, DANIEL A

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LLOYD, DEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/03/2004

Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: DAVID T. THOMPSON DBA WAYS & MEANS REAL ESTATE SERVICE; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: THOMPSON DAVID T.; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: 5TH AVENUE REAL ESTATE; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: ALESSIO, LAWRENCE R.; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2004

Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: LUNDRY WALLACE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: LYNCH, PAUL; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2005

Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF GLOBAL SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2005

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Hearing Time 09:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 8 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF GLOBAL SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2004

Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: NOTICE OF GLOBAL SETTLEMENT FILED 11/19/04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2004

Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2004

Jury Trial. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2004

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2004

Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: REJCTN LETTER MAILED OUT W/ UNFILED ANSWER OF LUND RYETC; FEE INSUFFICIENT (NEED $589.40).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2004

Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment SO2: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF WALLACE LUNDRY ET AL SIGNED BY JOHN G. SCHWARTZ ON 11/16/04.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
136 More Docket Entries
09/12/2003

Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: CANNOT LOCATE STEELE A SPENGLER HAS ALREADY BROUGHT A MOTION FOR PUBLICATION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2003

Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: WALLACE LUNDRY HAS BEEN SERVED..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2003

Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AT: ATTORNEY(S): PATRICK TALBOT HALL FOR PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2003

Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Comment JCR: HONORABLE ROBERT D. FOILES, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: DAWN ALFONSO. COURT REPORTER: CINDY DEL ROSARIO.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2003

Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2003

Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Conversion Continuance Comment Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2003

Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/01/2003

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2003

New Filed Case.

05/01/2003

Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2003

Complaint. Additional Info: Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records