This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 10:39:16 (UTC).

Stephen Debrunner, et al vs. Thomas Spielbauer

Case Summary

On 07/10/2018 Stephen Debrunner filed an Other lawsuit against Thomas Spielbauer. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Amsbaugh, Frank

Lavell, Daniel

Debrunner, Stephen

Nalley, Pat

Lavell, Heidi

Appellant and Defendant

Spielbauer, Thomas

Not Classified By Court

San Jose Facility - Civil

Not Yet Classified

Thomas Spielbauer

Stephen Debrunner

Frank Amsbaugh

Daniel Lavell

Heidi Lavell

Pat Nalley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Kelvin, David I.

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Spielbauer, Thomas J.

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Thomas J. Spielbauer

David I. Kelvin

 

Court Documents

Order

7/30/2018 Order

Clerk's Notice

7/12/2018 Clerk's Notice

Notice: Receipt of Record

7/10/2018 Notice: Receipt of Record

Notice

7/10/2018 Notice

 

Docket Entries

07/30/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Dismissing Appeal - This appeal is dismissed under CRC, rule 8.842. Judges Williams, Lie & Kulkarni

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: of Clerical Error

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: of Briefing Schedule *NOTE: THIS NTC WAS SENT IN ERROR/NO BRIEFING SCHED. HAS BEEN SET ON THIS CASE*

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice: Receipt of Record; Comment: Abbreviated Record to Obtain Dismissal of Appeal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2018

DocketDescription: Receipt: Clerk's Transcript

07/10/2018

DocketDescription: Notice: Appeal (Limited) - Up To $10K; Filed By: Thomas Spielbauer,; Comment: San Jose Facilty - Civil/ 115CV284003

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2018

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

Search Court Records