This case was last updated from Wisconsin Circuit Courts on 04/25/2025 at 06:28:37 (UTC).

In the Estate of Donna R Ludwig

Case Summary

On 02/06/2024 In the Estate of Donna R Ludwig was filed a Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Wisconsin Circuit Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2024

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Probate

Judge Details

Judge

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kaempf, Kathryn

Decedent

Ludwig, Donna R

Heirs

Ludwig, Paul

Kesler, Deborah

Creditors

Landmark Credit Union

Capital One, N.A. Menards

Fifth Third Bank, N.A.

JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.

Bank of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Herro, Susan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/30/2025

HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2025

DocketEvent: Petition for extension of time; Additional Text: Petition for Extension of Time to Close Estate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2025

DocketEvent: Proposed order extending time to close estate; Additional Text: Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Close Estate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2025

DocketEvent: Order extending time to close estate; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Extension granted to 06/30/2025

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2024

DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Amount: $14788.2; Additional Text: Full satisfaction of claim filed by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2024

DocketEvent: Withdrawn party for Fifth Third Bank, N.A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2024

DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Amount: $2789.0; Additional Text: Full satisfaction of claim filed by Capital One, Menards

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2024

DocketEvent: Withdrawn party for Capital One, N.A. Menards; Additional Text: Full satisfaction of claim filed by Capital One, Menards

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2024

DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $185949.85

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2024

DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $371.9; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 24A 194877, Payable Number: 212333, Receipt Number: 24R 013873, Amount: $371.90

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
02/06/2024

DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

02/06/2024

DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

02/06/2024

DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 24A 047834, Payable Number: 207052, Receipt Number: 24R 002143, Amount: $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2024

DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

02/06/2024

DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-Kathryn Kaempf, Paul Ludwig and Deborah Kesler

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2024

DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Consent to serve as personal representative-Kathryn Kaempf

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2024

DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

02/06/2024

DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2024

DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2024

DocketEvent: Date of death

Search Court Records