This case was last updated from Fauquier County Courts on 03/15/2023 at 12:40:52 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPAN VS COUNTY CHEVROLET INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COUNTY CHEVROLET INC. This case was filed in Fauquier County Courts, Fauquier County General District Court located in Fauquier, Virginia. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fauquier, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPAN

Defendants

WHITE, COREY

COUNTY CHEVROLET INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKENRY DANCIGERS DAWSON PC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/09/2021

HearingResult: Other

06/02/2021

HearingResult: Continued

03/30/2021

DocketService/Process; Person Served: COUNTY CHEVROLET INC; Process Type: Warrant In Debt; Date Returned: 03/31/2021; Plaintiff: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPAN; How Served: Registered Agent/Officer/Director(For Corp.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2021

DocketService/Process; Person Served: WHITE, COREY; Process Type: Warrant In Debt; Date Returned: 04/06/2021; Plaintiff: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPAN; How Served: Posted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records