This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/08/2024 at 04:04:14 (UTC).

GRAY v. ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA

Case Summary

On 07/10/2024 GRAY filed a Discrimination - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:24-cv-00227

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2024

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Discrimination - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRENDA GRAY

Defendant

ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BRENDA GRAY. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights)(ksl) (Entered: 07/11/2024)

1 #1

EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by BRENDA GRAY.(ksl) (Entered: 07/11/2024)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons by BRENDA GRAY.(ksl) (Entered: 07/11/2024)

#4

(#4) ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by BRENDA GRAY; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and terminating JEFF SEAMAN, CEO; MITCHELL S. ALLEN, VP General Counsel; ELLIOT KALICK, Regional Manager; ANA YAZBECK, HR Manager; and TONY SHERRON, Asst Manager. ORDER Directing Service on Rooms To Go pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 7/24/2024. (ech) (Entered: 07/24/2024)

#5

(#5) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA.(elp) (Entered: 07/24/2024)

#6

(#6) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA. (mdm) (Entered: 07/25/2024)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA., USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA (rka) (Entered: 08/08/2024)

 

Docket Entries

08/08/2024
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA., USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA (rka) (Entered: 08/08/2024)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2024
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA. (mdm) (Entered: 07/25/2024)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2024
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for ROOMS TO GO FURNITURE CORPORATION OF GEORGIA.(elp) (Entered: 07/24/2024)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2024
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by BRENDA GRAY; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and terminating JEFF SEAMAN, CEO; MITCHELL S. ALLEN, VP General Counsel; ELLIOT KALICK, Regional Manager; ANA YAZBECK, HR Manager; and TONY SHERRON, Asst Manager. ORDER Directing Service on Rooms To Go pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 7/24/2024. (ech) (Entered: 07/24/2024)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2024
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons by BRENDA GRAY.(ksl) (Entered: 07/11/2024)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2024
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by BRENDA GRAY.(ksl) (Entered: 07/11/2024)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2024
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BRENDA GRAY. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights)(ksl) (Entered: 07/11/2024)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records