This case was last updated from Texas Justice of the Peace Courts on 04/23/2025 at 04:49:35 (UTC).

Credit Corp Solutions Inc. vs. Lloyd Taylor

Case Summary

On 03/03/2023 Credit Corp Solutions Inc filed a Commercial and Trade - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lloyd Taylor. This case was filed in Texas Justice of the Peace Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Texas. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Commercial and Trade - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Corp Solutions Inc.

Defendant

Taylor, Lloyd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Matthew W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/27/2025

HearingDescription: Default Docket

08/27/2025

HearingHearing: Default Docket

03/14/2024

DocketProposed Order Filed

03/14/2024

DocketOther Documents Not Listed - Efile

03/14/2024

DocketMotion Filed

06/22/2023

DocketProposed Order Filed

06/22/2023

DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

06/22/2023

DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

06/22/2023

DocketExhibit Filed

1 More Docket Entries
05/17/2023

DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketProposed Order Filed

04/18/2023

DocketAffidavit Filed

03/28/2023

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Credit Corp Solutions Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDebt Claim-Citation

03/28/2023

DocketCitation

03/03/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

03/03/2023

DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

03/03/2023

DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

Search Court Records