This case was last updated from Texas Justice of the Peace Courts on 04/23/2025 at 04:35:51 (UTC).

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a. vs. Sara G Broughton

Case Summary

On 08/21/2024 Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N a filed a Commercial and Trade - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sara G Broughton. This case was filed in Texas Justice of the Peace Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Texas. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2024

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Commercial and Trade - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a.

Defendant

Broughton, Sara G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Turay, Janet Bintu

Other Attorneys

Parsons, Tracy L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/19/2024

HearingDescription: Motion Docket

11/19/2024

HearingHearing: Motion Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2024

DocketOrder Denied

11/13/2024

DocketProposed Order Filed

11/13/2024

DocketMotion for Continuance Filed

10/24/2024

DocketProposed Order Filed

10/24/2024

DocketOther Documents Not Listed - Efile

10/09/2024

DocketExhibit Filed

10/07/2024

DocketCounter/Cross/Interpleader/Intervention/Third Party-eFile

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2024

DocketAffidavit Filed

09/23/2024

DocketService Return

08/26/2024

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2024

DocketDebt Claim-Citation

08/26/2024

DocketCitation

08/21/2024

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

08/21/2024

DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

08/21/2024

DocketAffidavit Filed

08/21/2024

DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

Search Court Records