This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/01/2017 at 07:06:20 (UTC).

Amy Jensen vs. Robert M Saji, Sagi 'spections Llc

Case Summary

On 12/09/2013 Amy Jensen filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Robert M Saji, Sagi 'spections Llc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse :

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENSEN, AMY

Defendants

SAJI, ROBERT M

SAGISPECTIONS LLC

Sagi'spections Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYD, WILLIAM CLARK

Defendant Attorney

Binney, Geoffrey S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/18/2014

Dismissed

03/18/2014

Conversion Event

03/18/2014

Answer Filed

03/18/2014

Answer Due

02/18/2014

Conversion Event

02/12/2014

Answer Filed

02/12/2014

Answer Due

02/06/2014

Conversion Event

01/03/2014

Original Petition Filed

01/03/2014

Conversion Event

12/09/2013

Conversion Event

03/18/2014

Judgment: Parties For: Jensen, Amy; Parties Against: Saji, Robert M and others

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2014

Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records