This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/17/2023 at 16:01:22 (UTC).

CONN APPLIANCES, INC. VS HECTOR TORRES

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 CONN APPLIANCES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HECTOR TORRES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances, Inc.

Defendant

Hector Torres

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McKinney, Sara

Defendant Attorney

Fernandez, David

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

1 - Court Reporter Request for Record.pdf

Request: Court Reporters Records

amfc - order.pdf

Proposed Order: AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER

EX A.pdf

Motion for Continuance: Agreed Motion for Continuance Based on Scheduling Conflict

Agreed Mtn and Order for Continuance based on Scheduling Conflict.pdf

Motion for Continuance: Agreed Motion for Continuance Based on Scheduling Conflict

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Request

Request: for Citation

JP Citation

JP Citation

JP Notice

JP Notice: Return of Service

JP Answer

JP Answer: Original

JP Motion

JP Motion: to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to TRCP 500.9 (a) and Motion for the Rules of Evidence to Apply Pursuant to TRCP 500.3 (e) (1)

JP Order

JP Order: #1 (Unsigned) - on Motion to Conduct Discovery and for the Rules of Evidence to Apply Pursuant to TRCP 500.9 (a) and 500.3 (e) (1)

JP Order

JP Order: #2 (Signed) - on Motion to Conduct Discovery and for the Rules of Evidence to Apply Pursuant to TRCP 500.9 (a) and 500.3 (e) (1)

Letter

Letter

Pauper's Debt Letter

Pauper's Debt Letter: FILED BY HECTOR TORRES

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest: Court Reporters Records

11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProposed Order: AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Continuance: Agreed Motion for Continuance Based on Scheduling Conflict

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDebt Letter: FILED BY HECTOR TORRES

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJP Index

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJP Judgment: #2 (Unsigned) Trial

6 More Docket Entries
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest: for Trial Setting

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLetter

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJP Order: #2 (Signed) - on Motion to Conduct Discovery and for the Rules of Evidence to Apply Pursuant to TRCP 500.9 (a) and 500.3 (e) (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJP Order: #1 (Unsigned) - on Motion to Conduct Discovery and for the Rules of Evidence to Apply Pursuant to TRCP 500.9 (a) and 500.3 (e) (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJP Motion: to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to TRCP 500.9 (a) and Motion for the Rules of Evidence to Apply Pursuant to TRCP 500.3 (e) (1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJP Answer: Original

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJP Notice: Return of Service

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketJP Citation

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest: for Citation

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records