This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 12/07/2023 at 11:34:08 (UTC).

UNITED BIOMEDICAL, INC., et al vs. CHANG YI WANG, et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 UNITED BIOMEDICAL, INC , filed an Other lawsuit against CHANG YI WANG,. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNITED BIOMEDICAL, INC.

HU, MEI MEI

REESE, LOUIS G, IV

Defendants

WANG, CHANG YI

HU, NEAN

CYW GLOBAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRIEDMAN, LAWRENCE J

LEONARD, ERNEST WALTER

COKER, KYLE A

Defendant Attorneys

HICKOX, KENNETH N JR

LISER, SANDRA COCKRAN

 

Court Documents

JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE

Jury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

NOTICE OF HEARING RE: DEFENDANT (WANG) SPECIAL APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: RE: DEFENDANT (WANG) SPECIAL APPEARANCE

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING RE: SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT YI WANG

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING RE: SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT YI WANG

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: ADDITIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF HEARING RE: DEFENDANT SPECIAL APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: RE: DEFENDANT SPECIAL APPEARANCE

Proposed Order on Wang's Special Appearance.pdf

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER ON CHANG YI WANG'S SPECIAL APPEARANCE

SPECIAL APPEREANCE

SPECIAL APPEARANCE

MOTION TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN

PROPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN

MOTION - RETAIN

NO ACTIVITY LETTER

Final Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

NO ACTIVITY LETTER

Final Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

EXECUTED CITATION - NEAN HU

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - NEAN HU

ISSUE CITATION - CHANG YI WANG

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION- NEAN HU

ISSUE CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/01/2024
View Court Documents

DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSpecial Appearance; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: (IN PERSON) 30M KATINA KILIAN 817-509-2053

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: RE: DEFENDANT (WANG) SPECIAL APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketVACATION LETTER

07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSpecial Appearance; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: REQUESTED BY ATTORNEY/PRO SE; Comment: KATINA 817-509-2053

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING RE: SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT YI WANG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: ADDITIONAL COUNSEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: RE: DEFENDANT SPECIAL APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJury Trial - Civil; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
07/19/2022

DocketVACATION LETTER

06/13/2022

DocketNON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER ON MOTION TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION - RETAIN

06/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFinal Disposition Hearing; Judicial Officer: TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2022

DocketCITATION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Comment: CHANG YI WANG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: EXECUTED CITATION - NEAN HU

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2021

DocketCITATION; Served: 12/24/2021; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER: Returned; 12/28/2021: Comment; NEAN HU

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION

12/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION

12/21/2021

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

Search Court Records