This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 05/31/2022 at 14:16:33 (UTC).

MICHAEL GAJEWSKY vs. JD SECURITY SERVICES, LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS VISION VIDEO SECURITY, DAVID MULLINSS, AN INDIVIDUAL, KURT POETSCHKE, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 12/21/2016 MICHAEL GAJEWSKY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JD SECURITY SERVICES, LLC, DOING BUSINESS AS VISION VIDEO SECURITY, DAVID MULLINSS, AN INDIVIDUAL, KURT POETSCHKE, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FIFER, KING. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FIFER, KING

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAJEWSKY, MICHAEL

Defendants

JD SECURITY SERVICES, LLC

KURT POETSCHKE, AN INDIVIDUAL

DAVID MULLINSS, AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMMOND, MILTON G

 

Court Documents

Notice of Dismissal for Want of Presecution

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: C/O KURT POETSCHKE

Notice of Dismissal for Want of Presecution

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: C/O JD SECURITY SERVICES, LLC DBA VISION VIDEO SECURITY

Notice of Dismissal for Want of Presecution

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: C/O DAVID MULLINSS

Notice of Dismissal for Want of Presecution

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: C/O MILTON G HAMMOND

ORDER - DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

ORDER - DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

CCL#2 TR/MED/NON-JURY

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

CCL#2 TR/MED/NON-JURY

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

CCL#2 TR/MED/NON-JURY

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

CCL#2 TR/MED/NON-JURY

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

CCL#2 TR/MED/NON-JURY

NON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

1ccl#2 Y Letter

DISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

ORDER - MEDIATION

ORDER - MEDIATION

RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CITATION SERVED ON 01/26/2017 AT 1:08 PM

FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION

AMENDED PETITION; Comment: FIRST

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: THE PICK UP ONE WAS HELD 7 DAYS. MAILED BACK 01/19/2017

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: THE PICK UP ONE WAS HELD 7 DAYS. MAILED BACK 01/19/2017

ISSUE CITATION

ISSUE CITATION; Comment: THE PICK UP ONE WAS HELD 7 DAYS. MAILED BACK 01/19/2017

PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/19/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: C/O KURT POETSCHKE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: C/O JD SECURITY SERVICES, LLC DBA VISION VIDEO SECURITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: C/O DAVID MULLINSS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION; Comment: C/O MILTON G HAMMOND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNON JURY TRIAL; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2017
View Court Documents

DocketDISMISSAL HEARING; Judicial Officer: FIFER, KING; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: BY COURT ADMINISTRATOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2017
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - MEDIATION

02/20/2017
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

02/20/2017
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

2 More Docket Entries
01/31/2017
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CITATION SERVED ON 01/26/2017 AT 1:08 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2017

DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Unserved: Anticipated Server; ATTORNEY: Anticipated Method; Comment: ATTY PU

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2017

DocketCITATION (SERVICE); Served: 01/27/2017; Anticipated Server: CONSTABLE 3; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; CONSTABLE 3: Returned; 01/31/2017: Served; 01/26/2017: Anticipated Server; CONSTABLE 3: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: CONSTABLE 3; Returned: 01/31/2017; Comment: PCT 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2016

FinancialFinancial info for GAJEWSKY, MICHAEL : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (CC); Receipt # CV-2016-15315; GAJEWSKY, MICHAEL $524.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2016

FinancialFinancial info for GAJEWSKY, MICHAEL : Transaction Assessment; ; $524.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2016

FinancialFinancial: GAJEWSKY, MICHAEL ; Total Financial Assessment $524.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $524.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2016
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: FIRST

12/22/2016
View Court Documents

DocketISSUE CITATION; Comment: THE PICK UP ONE WAS HELD 7 DAYS. MAILED BACK 01/19/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2016
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION; Comment: PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2016

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA)

Search Court Records