This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 12/17/2022 at 20:59:49 (UTC).

MICHAEL DOLAN vs. DONNALYNN DOLAN

Case Summary

On 05/17/2016 MICHAEL DOLAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DONNALYNN DOLAN. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Family District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are GARCIA, DENNISE and COOKS, KIM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Dallas County District Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Dallas County Family District Courts

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

GARCIA, DENNISE

COOKS, KIM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOLAN, MICHAEL PAUL

Respondent

DOLAN, DONNALYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GILES, LINDA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/19/2016

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: GARCIA, DENNISE; Judgment Type: JUDGMENT NON-JURY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2016

DocketORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2016

DocketREPORT TO AUSTIN

08/19/2016

DocketNOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED

08/19/2016

DocketPROVE UP; Judicial Officer: COOKS, KIM; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: HEARING HELD; Parties Present: PETITIONER: DOLAN, MICHAEL PAUL; ATTORNEY: GILES, LINDA M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2016

DocketMEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

08/12/2016

DocketWAIVER

08/12/2016

DocketMISCELLANOUS EVENT; Comment: AGREEMENT INCIDENT TO DIVORCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2016

FinancialFinancial info for DOLAN, MICHAEL PAUL : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 31479-2016-DCLK; DOLAN, MICHAEL PAUL $292.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2016

FinancialFinancial info for DOLAN, MICHAEL PAUL : Transaction Assessment; ; $292.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2016

FinancialFinancial: DOLAN, MICHAEL PAUL ; Total Financial Assessment $292.00 ; Total Payments and Credits $292.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2016

DocketORIGINAL PETITION

05/17/2016

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - FAMILY

Search Court Records