This case was last updated from Dallas County Texas Courts on 06/18/2022 at 15:33:42 (UTC).

IDINE RESTAURANT GROUP IN vs. PJD INC

Case Summary

On 06/13/2003 IDINE RESTAURANT GROUP IN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PJD INC. This case was filed in Dallas County Texas Courts, Dallas County Texas Courts At Law located in Dallas, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MONTGOMERY, SALLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MONTGOMERY, SALLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IDINE RESTAURANT GROUP IN

Defendant

PJD INC

Not Classified By Court

Legacy Financial Management

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VINCENT, KEVIN MARK

Defendant Attorney

BEARD, JOHN THOMAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/25/2004

DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: ALL OTHER DISPOSITIONS; Converted Disposition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2004

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: S/J(D) | EventAmount:0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2004

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: ORD W/D(D) | EventAmount:0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2004

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: MOT W/D ATTY(D) | EventAmount:0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: MOT S/J(P) | EventAmount:0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: ORD REINSTATE(P) | EventAmount:0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: MOT REINSTATE(P) | EventAmount:0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: DISM (DWP)(P) | EventAmount:0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: BEARD(D) | EventAmount:0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: DEFT ATTY JOHN T(D) | EventAmount:0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
06/13/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: COURT RPT SVC FEE(P) | EventAmount:15.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: CLERKS FEE(P) | EventAmount:40.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: CIT ATTY(P) | EventAmount:4.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: CIT ATTY(P) | EventAmount:4.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: RECORD MGT FEE(P) | EventAmount:5.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: SECURITY FEE(P) | EventAmount:5.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: CONTINGENCY FUND(P) | EventAmount:5.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: STATE INDIGENCE(P) | EventAmount:5.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2003

DocketCounty Court - Mainframe exception; Comment: VINCENT K MARK(P) | EventAmount:128.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2003

DocketORIGINAL PETITION (OCA - NEW CASE FILED); Comment: Case Petitioned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records