This case was last updated from Dallas County District Courts on 05/21/2022 at 12:55:09 (UTC).

BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. vs. G AND G AUTOMOTIVE AND COLLISION, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 BMO HARRIS BANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against G AND G AUTOMOTIVE AND COLLISION, LLC. This case was filed in Dallas County District Courts, Dallas County Civil District Courts located in Dallas, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, CRAIG and MCFARLIN, SHERYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dallas, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, CRAIG

MCFARLIN, SHERYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.

Defendant

G AND G AUTOMOTIVE AND COLLISION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCLAIN, WILLIAM THOMAS

DADABHOY, AMMAR

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRETRIAL

ORDER - PRETRIAL; Comment: NON JURY

DC-18-06829 CIT 1.pdf

CITATION ISSUED

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

NOTICE OF HEARING ON THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT.pdf

NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT; Comment: on the Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Summary Judgment

DC-18-06829 CIT 2.pdf

CITATION ISSUED

ORIGINAL PETITION

ORIGINAL PETITION

Original Answser.Gral Denial.26829k.pdf

ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET.pdf

CASE FILING COVER SHEET

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: INTER'L SUMMARY JUDMNT AS TO GARZA G & G AUTOMOTIVE AND COLLISSION, LLC PENDING (NO ANS ON FILE)

192nd Cover Letter

Non Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: INTER'L SUMMARY JUDMNT AS TO GARZA G & G AUTOMOTIVE AND COLLISSION, LLC PENDING (NO ANS ON FILE)

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

Letter to clerk re ABJ - 06829.pdf

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

REQUEST FOR SERVICE

Proposed Order.pdf

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Plaintiff's motion for default judgment.pdf

MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

Proposed Order DC-18-06829.pdf

NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT; Comment: ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/20/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNon Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: SMITH, CRAIG; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: CASE CLOSED; Comment: INTER'L SUMMARY JUDMNT AS TO GARZA G & G AUTOMOTIVE AND COLLISSION, LLC PENDING (NO ANS ON FILE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2019

DocketEXECUTION; Unserved: Anticipated Server; MAIL: Anticipated Method; Comment: (1) 223/204

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2019

DocketABSTRACT JUDGMENT; Unserved: Anticipated Server; MAIL: Anticipated Method; Comment: MAIL ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2019

FinancialFinancial info for BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 20562-2019-DCLK; BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. $8.49

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2019

FinancialFinancial info for BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.49

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019

DocketISSUE WRIT; Comment: ATTY MAIL

03/27/2019
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE

02/26/2019

FinancialFinancial info for BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 12895-2019-DCLK; BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. $8.49

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2019

FinancialFinancial info for BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. : Transaction Assessment; ; $8.49

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2019

DocketISSUE ABSTRACT; Comment: ATTY MAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
06/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE; Comment: CITATION MARC ALEXANDER GARZA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2018

DocketCITATION; Served: 06/14/2018; Anticipated Server: ESERVE; Anticipated Method: Actual Server; OUT OF COUNTY: Returned; 06/15/2018: Served; 06/12/2018: Anticipated Server; ESERVE: Anticipated Method; Actual Server: OUT OF COUNTY; Returned: 06/14/2018; Comment: ESERVE/KM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCITATION ISSUED

05/25/2018

FinancialFinancial info for BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. : CREDIT CARD - TEXFILE (DC); Receipt # 33667-2018-DCLK; BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. $308.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2018

FinancialFinancial info for BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. : Transaction Assessment; ; $308.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2018

FinancialFinancial: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. ; Total Financial Assessment $324.98 ; Total Payments and Credits $324.98

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2018

DocketISSUE CITATION

05/25/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCASE FILING COVER SHEET

05/25/2018
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL PETITION

05/25/2018

DocketNEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL

Search Court Records