This case was last updated from Collin County Justice Courts on 12/03/2020 at 16:09:53 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. MISTY GARDNER

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 The State of Texas filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MISTY GARDNER. This case was filed in Collin County Justice Courts, Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse located in Collin, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Shaffer, Jerry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse :

    Collin County Farmersville Sub-Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Collin, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Shaffer, Jerry

 

Party Details

Defendant

GARDNER, MISTY ELAINE

Not Classified By Court

The State of Texas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/20/2020

DocketNotice; Comments: In accordance with the standing Order regarding Coronavirus Mitigation to all Collin County Justice Court order No 1, ALL TICKETS have been extended to June 1, 2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2020

DocketRecalled Warrant

02/26/2020

FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $227.00, Payments: $227.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: ($227.00); Payor: Misty Gardner; Receipt: Receipt # 2020-00626-JP2; Description: Payment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2020

DocketPaid Fines Online

01/21/2020

FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $227.00, Payments: $227.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $25.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2020

DocketPlea

01/21/2020

DocketDeferred Granted - Order; Comments: payment due 02/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2020

FinancialFinancial Summary-: Party Type: Defendant, Charges: $227.00, Payments: $227.00, Balance:$0.00; Transactions: Amount: $202.00; Description: Transaction Assessment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2020

DocketCitation Filed (OCA)

12/31/2019

ChargeCharge-: Charge # 1 Code: 06922 Description: SPEEDING-10% OR MORE ABOVE POSTED SPEED (#) 83/65 Degree: 114; Level: Misdemeanor Traffic; Statute: 545.351; Fine Amount: $81.90; Filing Agency: Department of Public Safety

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records