This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2020 at 11:55:25 (UTC).

Schabel v. Sapstead et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Schabel filed a Civil - Personal Injury and Torts lawsuit against Sapstead. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel D. Crabtree and Gwynne E. Birzer. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-cv-02344

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Civil - Personal Injury and Torts

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Crabtree

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina Schabel

Defendants

Jeremiah 29:11, Inc.

Chris Sapstead

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel A. Singer

Ashley Billam

Lynn R. Johnson

Defendant Attorney

Kathryn A. Lewis

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

1 #1

Redacted Complaint

2 #1

Redacted Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Redacted Designation of Place of Trial

#4

4 #1

Redacted Civil Cover Sheet

4 #2

Redacted Designation of Place of Trial

#6

#7

#9

#10

#11

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/2/2020. (ala) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jeremiah 29:11, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Lewis, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Jeremiah 29:11, Inc..(Lewis, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Chris Sapstead.(Lewis, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2020

Docket(#8) ORDER extending Response Deadline to 8/31/2020. The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Extension of Time to Answer explaining that they have agreed to an extension of time for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint up to and including August 31, 2020. The court thus extends the response deadline to 8/31/2020. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 7/28/2020. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/29/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn A. Lewis on behalf of All Defendants (Lewis, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Answer by Jeremiah 29:11, Inc., Chris Sapstead. (Lewis, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2020

Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. District Judge Eric F. Melgren no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DOCKET ANNOTATION: Redacted version of documents #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation of Place of Trial has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Redacted Designation of Place of Trial) (ca) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2020

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeremiah 29:11, Inc., Chris Sapstead. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2020

DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Christina Schabel - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Johnson, Lynn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2020: #1 Redacted Designation of Place of Trial) (ca). Modified on 7/9/2020 to block original Designation of Place of Trial due to violation of privacy policy and add redacted Designation of Place of Trial (ca). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Christina Schabel. (Johnson, Lynn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2020: #1 Redacted Civil Cover Sheet) (ca). Modified on 7/9/2020 to block original Civil Cover Sheet due to violation of privacy policy and add redacted Civil cover Sheet (ca). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5191514.), filed by Christina Schabel.(Johnson, Lynn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2020: #1 Redacted Complaint) (ca). Modified on 7/9/2020 to block original Complaint due to violation of privacy policy and add redacted Complaint (ca). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records