This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 08:22:09 (UTC).

Jackson v. TransUnion, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Jackson filed a Finance and Lending - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TransUnion, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip G. Reinhard and Margaret J. Schneider. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-cv-50284

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Finance and Lending - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip G. Reinhard

Referral Judge

Margaret J. Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Talib Jackson

Defendants

TransUnion, LLC

City National Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harold Mark Garfinkel

Yitzchak Zelman

Defendant Attorneys

Laura K. Rang

Sandra Davis Jansen

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

08/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TransUnion, LLC (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC(Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Talib Jackson as to TransUnion, LLC on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Talib Jackson as to City National Bank on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TransUnion, LLC by Laura K. Rang (Rang, Laura) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TransUnion, LLC by Sandra Davis Jansen (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2021

DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants City National Bank, TransUnion, LLC (txl, ) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Initial status hearing set for 10/08/21 at 9:15 a.m. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Schneider's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports, and file by 10/01/21. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Public access is available via the following call-in number: 1-(650)-479-3207 and enter ACCESS CODE: 180-822-8235#. Counsel of record will receive an email the day prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Talib Jackson by Harold Mark Garfinkel Local Counsel (Garfinkel, Harold) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021

DocketMAILED Local Rule 83.15 to Counsel for plaintiff. (jp, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Talib Jackson by Yitzchak Zelman (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Talib Jackson; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18465624. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records