This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 10:02:48 (UTC).

Espegard v. SD Wheel Corp.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Espegard filed a Labor and Employment - Labor Standard lawsuit against SD Wheel Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-cv-00849

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Labor and Employment - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dallas Espegard

Defendant

SD Wheel Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott S Luzi

Defendant Attorneys

Laurie E Meyer

Anthony J Steffek

Anne V O'Meara

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Dallas Espegard Consent to Join Form

#2

#3

#4

(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dallas Espegard. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

08/30/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #7 Stipulated MOTION for extension of time to October 22, 2021, to answer or otherwise plead, filed by SD Wheel Corp., signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 08/30/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Steffek on behalf of SD Wheel Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony J. Steffek (Steffek, Anthony)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Anne V O'Meara on behalf of SD Wheel Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Anne V. O'Meara (O'Meara, Anne)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by SD Wheel Corp. (Meyer, Laurie)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie E Meyer on behalf of SD Wheel Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Laurie E. Meyer (Meyer, Laurie)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SD Wheel Corp. - Waiver sent on 7/16/2021. (Luzi, Scott)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021

DocketSummons Issued as to SD Wheel Corp. (tlf)

07/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dallas Espegard. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021

DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Dallas Espegard. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi (Luzi, Scott)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Dallas Espegard. (Luzi, Scott)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against SD Wheel Corp. by Dallas Espegard. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3870943) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Dallas Espegard Consent to Join Form)(Luzi, Scott)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records