This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2022 at 07:59:14 (UTC).

CARROLL v. DELAWARE COUNTY OF PA et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2021 CARROLL filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against DELAWARE COUNTY OF PA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. KEARNEY. The case status is Closed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-cv-05289

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Closed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. KEARNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARTIS C. CARROLL, JR.

Defendants

DELAWARE COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATION

UPPER DARBY POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRY J. KARAPALLDES

DELAWARE COUNTY OF PA et al

DELAWARE COUNTY COUNTY COURT ADMINISTRATION

MAGISTERIAL DISTRICT COURT

ELISA C. LACLANCA

JOHN DOE

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

#2

No Description Available

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT IF MR. CARROLL SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, NO LATER THAN JANUARY 3, 2022, EITHER: (1) PAY $402 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $52 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT; OR, FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH MR. CARROLL WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. WE MAY DISMISS THIS CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE IF MR. CARROLL FAILS TO TIMELY COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/2/2021. 12/3/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH IFP APPLICATION.(sg, ) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDERED: 1. MR. CARROLLS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; AND, 2. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/18/2022. 1/18/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

01/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDOC. NO. #4 MAILED TO PRO SE IN 1/19/22. (amas) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDERED: 1. MR. CARROLLS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; AND, 2. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/18/2022. 1/18/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ORDER THAT IF MR. CARROLL SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS ACTION HE MUST, NO LATER THAN JANUARY 3, 2022, EITHER: (1) PAY $402 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $52 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT; OR, FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH MR. CARROLL WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. WE MAY DISMISS THIS CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE IF MR. CARROLL FAILS TO TIMELY COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/2/2021. 12/3/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH IFP APPLICATION.(sg, ) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records