This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/27/2022 at 07:26:43 (UTC).

Ghada Oueiss v. Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Ghada Oueiss filed a Civil lawsuit against Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-11408

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Civil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GHADA OUEISS

Defendants

TAREK ABOU ZEINAB

TURKI AL-OWERDE

AWWAD AL OTAIBI

FAISAL AL MENAIA

ANNETTE SMITH

SAM JUNDI

CHRISTANNE SCHEY

SHARON VAN RIDER

MOHAMMED BIN SALMAN BIN ABDULAZIZ AL SAUD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason L. Mays

Jeffrey Eldridge Marcus

Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell R. Berger

Marcos Daniel Jimenez

Andrew C. Shen

Gregory G. Rapawy

Michael Kellogg

Benjamin Henry Brodsky

Other Attorneys

David Oscar Markus

Barry J. Pollack

31 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Oscar Markus for Appellee Saud Al Qahtani. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: David Markus) [Entered: 06/01/2022 02:54 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellees Annette Smith and Sam Jundi Attorney Marcos Daniel Jimenez for Appellees Sam Jundi, Sharon Van Rider, Christanne Schey and Annette Smith. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: Marcos Jimenez) [Entered: 05/31/2022 04:28 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Justin Richard Cochran for Appellees Al-Asaker Bader and Prince Mohammed Bin Salman Abdulaziz Foundation. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: Justin Cochran) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:18 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Evelyn Sheehan for Appellees Masharea wa Enjazat IT Corporation, LLC and Middle East News, FZ-LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: Evelyn Sheehan) [Entered: 05/31/2022 02:50 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Benjamin Henry Brodsky for Appellee Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: Benjamin Brodsky) [Entered: 05/31/2022 12:01 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James E. Tysse for Appellee DarkMatter. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: James Tysse) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:53 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Natasha G. Kohne for DarkMatter. [22-11408] (ECF: Natasha Kohne) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:51 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Anthony T. Pierce for DarkMatter. [22-11408] (ECF: Anthony Pierce) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:49 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mitchell R. Berger for Appellees Turki Al-Owerde, Faisal Al Menaia and Awwad Al Otaibi. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: Mitchell Berger) [Entered: 05/26/2022 08:21 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Kellogg for Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. [22-11408] (ECF: Michael Kellogg) [Entered: 05/11/2022 04:33 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jeffrey Eldridge Marcus for Appellant Ghada Oueiss. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [22-11408] (ECF: Jeffrey Marcus) [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:48 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey Eldridge Marcus for Ghada Oueiss. [22-11408] (ECF: Jeffrey Marcus) [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:46 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Benjamin Henry Brodsky for Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. [22-11408] (ECF: Benjamin Brodsky) [Entered: 05/05/2022 04:51 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen James Binhak for Dark Matter Stephen James Binhak for DarkMatter. [22-11408] (ECF: Stephen Binhak) [Entered: 05/05/2022 10:08 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James E. Tysse for DarkMatter. [22-11408] (ECF: James Tysse) [Entered: 05/05/2022 09:17 AM]

Open Document #3

Order DE# 200

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David Oscar Markus for Appellee Saud Al Qahtani. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: David Markus) [Entered: 06/01/2022 02:54 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellees Annette Smith and Sam Jundi Attorney Marcos Daniel Jimenez for Appellees Sam Jundi, Sharon Van Rider, Christanne Schey and Annette Smith. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: Marcos Jimenez) [Entered: 05/31/2022 04:28 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Justin Richard Cochran for Appellees Al-Asaker Bader and Prince Mohammed Bin Salman Abdulaziz Foundation. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: Justin Cochran) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:18 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Evelyn Sheehan for Appellees Masharea wa Enjazat IT Corporation, LLC and Middle East News, FZ-LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: Evelyn Sheehan) [Entered: 05/31/2022 02:50 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Benjamin Henry Brodsky for Appellee Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: Benjamin Brodsky) [Entered: 05/31/2022 12:01 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James E. Tysse for Appellee DarkMatter. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: James Tysse) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:53 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Natasha G. Kohne for DarkMatter. [22-11408] (ECF: Natasha Kohne) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:51 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Anthony T. Pierce for DarkMatter. [22-11408] (ECF: Anthony Pierce) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:49 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mitchell R. Berger for Appellees Turki Al-Owerde, Faisal Al Menaia and Awwad Al Otaibi. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11408] (ECF: Mitchell Berger) [Entered: 05/26/2022 08:21 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew Kruppa for Turki Al-Owerde, Faisal Al Menaia, Awwad Al Otaibi and Tarek Abou Zeinab. [22-11408] (ECF: Andrew Kruppa) [Entered: 05/26/2022 09:26 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher M. Young for Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud [22-11408] (ECF: Christopher Young) [Entered: 05/11/2022 04:38 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew C. Shen for Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. [22-11408] (ECF: Andrew Shen) [Entered: 05/11/2022 04:37 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gregory G. Rapawy for Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. [22-11408] (ECF: Gregory Rapawy) [Entered: 05/11/2022 04:35 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Kellogg for Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. [22-11408] (ECF: Michael Kellogg) [Entered: 05/11/2022 04:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jeffrey Eldridge Marcus for Appellant Ghada Oueiss. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [22-11408] (ECF: Jeffrey Marcus) [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:48 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey Eldridge Marcus for Ghada Oueiss. [22-11408] (ECF: Jeffrey Marcus) [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:46 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Benjamin Henry Brodsky for Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud. [22-11408] (ECF: Benjamin Brodsky) [Entered: 05/05/2022 04:51 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen James Binhak for Dark Matter Stephen James Binhak for DarkMatter. [22-11408] (ECF: Stephen Binhak) [Entered: 05/05/2022 10:08 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James E. Tysse for DarkMatter. [22-11408] (ECF: James Tysse) [Entered: 05/05/2022 09:17 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Ghada Oueiss on 04/27/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/07/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/16/2022 as to Appellant Ghada Oueiss. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/31/2022 as to Appellees DarkMatter, Mohammed Bin Salman Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud, Prince Mohammed Bin Salman Abdulaziz Foundation, Saud Al Qahtani and Tarek Abou Zeinab [Entered: 05/02/2022 12:59 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records