This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 02/23/2023 at 05:03:01 (UTC).

OKLAHOMA HI-TECH, INC. D/B/A SERVICEMASTER RESTORATION BY RSI, AN OKLAHOMA CORPORATION Plaintiff, v. Stephen Kumor, AN INDIVIDUAL and Sabrina Kumer, AN INDIVIDUAL Defendant.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 OKLAHOMA HI-TECH, INC D/B/A SERVICEMASTER RESTORATION BY RSI, AN OKLAHOMA CORPORATION Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stephen Kumor, AN INDIVIDUAL and Sabrina Kumer, AN INDIVIDUAL Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Burton, Catherine M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Burton, Catherine M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oklahoma Hi-Tech Inc

Defendants

Kumor, Stephen

Kumer, Sabrina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hamm, Austin L

Couch, Daniel G.

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE/ATTORNEY FOR PLAIN

03/19/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE/ATTORNEY FOR PLAIN

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SABRINA KUMOR BY PERS. SERV. ON 3/27/21

03/31/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SABRINA KUMOR BY PERS. SERV. ON 3/27/21

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: STEPHEN KUMOR BY DELIVERING COPY TO SABRINA KUMOR ON 3/27/21

03/31/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: STEPHEN KUMOR BY DELIVERING COPY TO SABRINA KUMOR ON 3/27/21

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

06/23/2021: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

06/23/2021

DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Kumer, Sabrina

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Kumor, Stephen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: Kumer, Sabrina

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: Kumor, Stephen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021

DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021

DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: STEPHEN KUMOR BY DELIVERING COPY TO SABRINA KUMOR ON 3/27/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SABRINA KUMOR BY PERS. SERV. ON 3/27/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-4966840 ON 03/19/2021. PAYOR: PERRI DUNN PLLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 249.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2021-1845: $170.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2021-1845: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2021-1845: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-1845: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2021-1845: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-1845: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2021-1845: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2021-1845: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-1845: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-1845: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2021-1845: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CS-2021-1845: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE BURTON, CATHERINE M. TO THIS CASE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
03/19/2021

DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2021

DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Oklahoma Hi-Tech Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records