This case was last updated from Oklahoma District Courts on 04/20/2025 at 02:01:30 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS. BROWN, AMY LYNN et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2024 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Real Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BROWN, AMY LYNN. This case was filed in Oklahoma District Courts, Delaware County Courthouse located in Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCAFFREY, JENNIFER. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2024

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Real Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Judge

MCAFFREY, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

BROWN, AMY LYNN

CASEY, JOHNNY WAYNE

PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE

DOE, JANE

DOE, JOHN

CHEROKEE NATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JENKINS, KIM S.

CALVERT, GREGORY

 

Court Documents

ISSUING FOUR SUMMONS FOR ATTORNEY

09/25/2024: ISSUING FOUR SUMMONS FOR ATTORNEY

PETITION

09/25/2024: PETITION

SUMMONS AND RETURN - PETITION AND SUMMONS SERVED TO CHEROKEE NATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 10/7/24

11/18/2024: SUMMONS AND RETURN - PETITION AND SUMMONS SERVED TO CHEROKEE NATION BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 10/7/24

SUMMONS AND RETURN - PETITION AND SUMMONS SERVED TO AMY L. BROWN BY LEAVING CAMRY STEVENS ON 10/22/24 BY PS

11/18/2024: SUMMONS AND RETURN - PETITION AND SUMMONS SERVED TO AMY L. BROWN BY LEAVING CAMRY STEVENS ON 10/22/24 BY PS

SUMMONS AND RETURN - NO SERVICE ON JOHN DOE PER PS

11/18/2024: SUMMONS AND RETURN - NO SERVICE ON JOHN DOE PER PS

SUMMONS AND RETURN - NO SERVICE ON JANE DOE PER PS

11/18/2024: SUMMONS AND RETURN - NO SERVICE ON JANE DOE PER PS

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY GREGORY CALVERT FOR CHEROKEE NATION

11/12/2024: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY GREGORY CALVERT FOR CHEROKEE NATION

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

11/27/2024: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/27/2024: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

12/30/2024: JE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

FILE AND ISSUE SPECIAL EXECUTION & ORDER OF SALE

01/16/2025: FILE AND ISSUE SPECIAL EXECUTION & ORDER OF SALE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

01/16/2025: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

BILL OF APPRAISERS - SABRINA YOCHAM $150.00, PAM BOHALL $150.00, LUCINDA SIXKILLER $150.00

03/07/2025: BILL OF APPRAISERS - SABRINA YOCHAM $150.00, PAM BOHALL $150.00, LUCINDA SIXKILLER $150.00

NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE - 04/07/25 AT 10AM

03/07/2025: NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE - 04/07/25 AT 10AM

ISSUED/FILED ALIAS SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE

03/24/2025: ISSUED/FILED ALIAS SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE

ALIAS NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE - 05/12/25 AT 10AM

03/26/2025: ALIAS NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE - 05/12/25 AT 10AM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/02/2025

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO POUNDAGE; Amount: $ 4.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2025

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VOUCHER #2125580 / LUCINDA SIXKILLER / APPRAISER; Amount: $ 148.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2025

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VOUCHER #2125579 / PAM BOHALL / APPRAISER; Amount: $ 148.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2025

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VOUCHER #2125578 / SABRINA YOCHAM / APPRAISER; Amount: $ 148.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2025
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE - 05/12/25 AT 10AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2025
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED/FILED ALIAS SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2025
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE - 04/07/25 AT 10AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2025
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BILL OF APPRAISERS - SABRINA YOCHAM $150.00, PAM BOHALL $150.00, LUCINDA SIXKILLER $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2025
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2025

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
09/25/2024

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Count: 1; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2024

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Count: 1; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2024

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Count: 1; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2024

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Count: 1; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2024

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Count: 1; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2024

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Count: 1; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2024

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/1/04; Count: 1; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2024

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Count: 1; Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2024

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Count: 1; Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2024
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Count: 1; Amount: $ 163.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records