This case was last updated from Oklahoma District Courts on 04/10/2025 at 02:50:16 (UTC).

TERESA PETERSEN, Plaintiff, v. BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE LLC, D/B/A CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC RECONSTRUCTION & EXCELLENCE, Defendant, and LYNNE IMHOFF MD, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2024 TERESA PETERSEN, Plaintiff, filed a Malpractice - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE LLC, D/B/A CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC RECONSTRUCTION EXCELLENCE, Defendant, and LYNNE IMHOFF MD, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma District Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Oklahoma. The case status is Open.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2024

  • Case Status:

    Open

  • Case Type:

    Malpractice - Medical Malpractice

  • State:

    Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETERSEN, TERESA

Defendants

BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE LLC

IMHOFF, LYNNE MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALLAGHER, SCOTT

Defendant Attorneys

BOOK, ADDISON E

BLANTON, SETH R

Other Attorneys

STEVENS, KIMIBERLY A

 

Court Documents

PETITION

01/09/2024: PETITION

PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. ON LYNNE IMHOFF MD / ON 1-27-24

01/30/2024: PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. ON LYNNE IMHOFF MD / ON 1-27-24

SUMMONS HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED / BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE LLC / NO DATE REFLECTED ON CERT MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

02/06/2024: SUMMONS HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED / BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE LLC / NO DATE REFLECTED ON CERT MAIL RETURN RECEIPT

PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. ON LYNNE IMHOFF MD /ON 1-27-24

02/07/2024: PARTY HAS BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. ON LYNNE IMHOFF MD /ON 1-27-24

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / KIMBERLY A STEVENS AND ADDISON E BOOK ENTER ON BEHALF OF BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE LLC / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

04/10/2024: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / KIMBERLY A STEVENS AND ADDISON E BOOK ENTER ON BEHALF OF BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE LLC / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

04/10/2024: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

04/18/2024: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / SETH R BLANTON ENTERS ON BEHALF OF LYNNE M IMHOFF, MD / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

05/03/2024: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / SETH R BLANTON ENTERS ON BEHALF OF LYNNE M IMHOFF, MD / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

DEFENDANT LYNNE M IMHOFF, M.D'S ANSWER TO PLAIN 'S PETITION / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

05/10/2024: DEFENDANT LYNNE M IMHOFF, M.D'S ANSWER TO PLAIN 'S PETITION / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

PLAIN 'S MOTION REQUEST SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/01/2024: PLAIN 'S MOTION REQUEST SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER FOR HEARING

08/26/2024: ORDER FOR HEARING

AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER

09/23/2024: AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER

MOTION OF ATTORNEY ADDISON E. BOOK TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA CENTER FOR OTRHOPAEDIC RECONSTRUCTION AND EXCELLENCE / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE / C - J

02/13/2025: MOTION OF ATTORNEY ADDISON E. BOOK TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA CENTER FOR OTRHOPAEDIC RECONSTRUCTION AND EXCELLENCE / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE / C - J

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/13/2025: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / MADISON A. STEVENS ENTERS ON BEHALF OF BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE, LLC / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/13/2025: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / MADISON A. STEVENS ENTERS ON BEHALF OF BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE, LLC / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER

02/26/2025: ORDER

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/26/2025
View Court Documents

DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER

02/21/2025

DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: PRIDDY, TRACY L: ORDER ENTERED. MOTION TO WITHDRAW OF ATTORNEY ((CLERK PLACED ORDER IN JUDGE'S OUTBOX FOR PICKUP AND FILING.))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2025
View Court Documents

DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / MADISON A. STEVENS ENTERS ON BEHALF OF BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE, LLC / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Party: BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2025
View Court Documents

DocketCode: CER; Description: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2025
View Court Documents

DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION OF ATTORNEY ADDISON E. BOOK TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BRISTOW ENDEAVOR HEALTHCARE, LLC DBA CENTER FOR OTRHOPAEDIC RECONSTRUCTION AND EXCELLENCE / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE / C - J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2024
View Court Documents

DocketCode: AGORD; Description: AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2024

DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: PRIDDY, TRACY L: CASE COMES ON FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; SCOTT GALLAGHER APPEARS FOR PLAIN ; SETH BLANTON AND ADDISON BOOK APPEARS FOR DEFENDANT; AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET ON JULY 7, 2025 AT 9:45 AM IN COURTROOM 508; DEFENSE COUNSEL TO FILE ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2024
View Court Documents

DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2024

DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: PRIDDY, TRACY L: ORDER FOR HEARING ENTERED. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET ON SEPTEMBER 23, 2024 AT 10:30 AM IN COURTROOM 508. ((CLERK FILED AND MAILED SIGNED COPY WITH ENVELOPE PROVIDED TO BE FILED.))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2024
View Court Documents

DocketCode: MO; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION REQUEST SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
01/09/2024

DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024
View Court Documents

DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

DocketCode: MEDNEG; Description: MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

DocketIssue #1; Issue: MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE(MEDNEG); Filed By: PETERSEN, TERESA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records