This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 03/28/2020 at 17:44:08 (UTC).

REYNALDO QUINTANILLA - v. - THOMAS SCHUTT et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 REYNALDO QUINTANILLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THOMAS SCHUTT. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Otsego, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reynaldo Quintanilla

Defendants

Kelly A. Mott

Thomas Schutt

Vincent Violante

Kathleen Violante

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGMAN, MICHAEL E

Defendant Attorneys

COHEN, EVAN BRUCE

SHEARER, DOUGLAS ANDREW

EISENBERG, SCOTT PAUL

 

Court Documents

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

ORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Statement; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) def Kelly Mott-Schutt's EBT Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) def Kelly Mott-Schutt's EBT Transcript; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Non-Party Witness Votto's EBT Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Non-Party Witness Votto's EBT Transcript; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Plaintiff's EBT transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Plaintiff's EBT transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition to defs SJ Motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition to defs SJ Motion; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to Court Requesting adjournment of Defs Motion

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to Court Requesting adjournment of Defs Motion; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

VERIFICATION OF ANSWER

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER & DEMANDS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS for S&C on Vincent Violante

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS for S&C on Thomas Schutt

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS for S&C on Kelly Mott

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS for S&C on Kathleen Violante

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Statement; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) def Kelly Mott-Schutt's EBT Transcript; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Non-Party Witness Votto's EBT Transcript; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Plaintiff's EBT transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition to defs SJ Motion; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter to Court Requesting adjournment of Defs Motion; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 01/15/2020; Received: 01/15/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION 17-112-EBC; Filed By: Cohen, E.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
12/14/2017
View Court Documents

DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 12/14/2017; Received: 12/14/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2017
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE VERIFICATION OF ANSWER; Filed By: Cohen, E.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2017
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANSWER & DEMANDS; Filed By: Cohen, E.; Filed: 10/19/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2017
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 10/09/2017; Received: 10/09/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2017
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Shearer, D.; Filed: 10/09/2017; Received: 10/09/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2017
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for S&C on Vincent Violante; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2017
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for S&C on Thomas Schutt; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2017
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for S&C on Kelly Mott; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2017
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for S&C on Kathleen Violante; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2017
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bergman, M.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records