This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 05/03/2023 at 21:03:29 (UTC).

Lena Riportella v. Robert M Dagostino

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Lena Riportella filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Robert M Dagostino. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Otsego, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher Modelewski. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher Modelewski

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lena Riportella

Defendant and Petitioner

Robert M Dagostino

Respondent

Paul Riportella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COSTANTINO, JOSEPH ANDREW

Petitioner Attorney

STEVEN ROY KARTZINEL

Defendant Attorney

KARTZINEL, STEVEN ROY

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile & Tambasco; Filed: 10/03/2022; Received: 10/03/2022

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile & Tambasco; Filed: 10/03/2022; Received: 10/03/2022

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Discovery & Inspection

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Discovery & Inspection; Filed By: Costantino, J.; Filed: 04/05/2022; Received: 04/05/2022

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/01/2022; Received: 03/01/2022

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Costantino, J.; Filed: 02/25/2022; Received: 02/25/2022

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2022; Received: 02/07/2022

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2022; Received: 02/03/2022

BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Costantino, J.; Filed: 12/14/2021; Received: 12/14/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Plaintiffs Summons and Complaint and Defendants Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - A Plaintiffs Summons and Complaint and Defendants Answer; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile & Tambasco; Filed: 11/09/2021; Received: 11/09/2021

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 10/26/2021; Received: 10/26/2021

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 10/26/2021; Received: 10/26/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A Pleadings; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 06/16/2021; Received: 06/16/2021

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 06/16/2021; Received: 06/16/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Costantino, J. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Costantino, J. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Costantino, J.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile & Tambasco; Filed: 10/03/2022; Received: 10/03/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile & Tambasco; Filed: 10/03/2022; Received: 10/03/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Discovery & Inspection; Filed By: Costantino, J.; Filed: 04/05/2022; Received: 04/05/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/01/2022; Received: 03/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Costantino, J.; Filed: 02/25/2022; Received: 02/25/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/07/2022; Received: 02/07/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2022; Received: 02/03/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Costantino, J.; Filed: 12/14/2021; Received: 12/14/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Plaintiffs Summons and Complaint and Defendants Answer; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile & Tambasco; Filed: 11/09/2021; Received: 11/09/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile & Tambasco; Filed: 11/09/2021; Received: 11/09/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile & Tambasco; Filed: 11/09/2021; Received: 11/16/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 10/26/2021; Received: 10/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 10/26/2021; Received: 10/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Pleadings; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 06/16/2021; Received: 06/16/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 06/16/2021; Received: 06/16/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Filed By: Kartzinel, S. - filed by Gentile and Tambasco; Filed: 06/15/2021; Received: 06/15/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Costantino, J. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Costantino, J. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Costantino, J.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records