This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 05/03/2023 at 20:33:24 (UTC).

Kevin N Webster v. Yousef Saljooki

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Kevin N Webster filed an Other lawsuit against Yousef Saljooki. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Madison, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent J. Martorana. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent J. Martorana

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin N Webster

Defendant

Yousef Saljooki

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHNUR, BRADLEY D.

 

Court Documents

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001); Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Arbitration Award

EXHIBIT(S) - A Arbitration Award; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of Correspondence; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of Correspondence; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/07/2021; Received: 07/07/2021

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service upon Respondent

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service upon Respondent; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 07/21/2021; Received: 07/21/2021

NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) Amended Notice of Petition - Return Date 08.12.21

NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) Amended Notice of Petition - Return Date 08.12.21; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 07/21/2021; Received: 07/21/2021

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/06/2021; Received: 10/06/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry (Decision & Order)

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry (Decision & Order); Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 11/02/2021; Received: 11/02/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry (Proposed Judgment)

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry (Proposed Judgment); Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 11/02/2021; Received: 11/02/2021

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 11/02/2021; Received: 11/02/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS (Judgment, Order, Notice of Taxation/Bill of Costs)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS (Judgment, Order, Notice of Taxation/Bill of Costs); Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 11/02/2021; Received: 11/02/2021

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 11/02/2021; Received: 11/02/2021

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/03/2021; Received: 11/13/2021

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/03/2021; Received: 11/13/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 11/02/2021; Received: 11/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS (Judgment, Order, Notice of Taxation/Bill of Costs); Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 11/02/2021; Received: 11/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 11/02/2021; Received: 11/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry (Proposed Judgment); Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 11/02/2021; Received: 11/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry (Decision & Order); Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 11/02/2021; Received: 11/02/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/06/2021; Received: 10/06/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) Amended Notice of Petition - Return Date 08.12.21; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 07/21/2021; Received: 07/21/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service upon Respondent; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 07/21/2021; Received: 07/21/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/07/2021; Received: 07/07/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of Correspondence; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Copy of Correspondence; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Arbitration Award; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001); Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION; Filed By: Schnur, B.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records