This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 05/03/2023 at 20:37:42 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. v. WALLACE F MOYER

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WALLACE F MOYER. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Madison, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Wallace F Moyer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/31/2021; Received: 05/31/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/31/2021; Received: 05/31/2021

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/21/2021; Received: 09/21/2021

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/08/2021; Received: 12/08/2021

 

Docket Entries

12/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 12/08/2021; Received: 12/08/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 09/21/2021; Received: 09/21/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/31/2021; Received: 05/31/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/31/2021; Received: 05/31/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Redacted Charge Off Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records