This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 05/03/2023 at 20:32:20 (UTC).

BCMB1 TRUST v. EVAN LECAKES et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 BCMB1 TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against EVAN LECAKES. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Otsego, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BCMB1 TRUST

Defendants

Evan Lecakes

Desiree Lecakes fka desiree pirraglia

JOHN DOE No. 1 through JOHN DOE No. 99, said names being fictitious, parties intended being possible tenants or occupants of premises, and corporations, other entities or persons who claim, or may claim, a lien against the premises

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FALKOWSKI, MICHAL

RICHLAND, DANIEL H.

Defendant Attorney

SAKHIZADA, QUIES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A-F Schedule A-F to the Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A-F Schedule A-F to the Complaint; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Evan Lecakes

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Evan Lecakes; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Desiree Lecakes

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Desiree Lecakes; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Attempted Service - John Does

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Attempted Service - John Does; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - RJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - RJI; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Sakhizada, Q.; Filed: 05/19/2021; Received: 05/19/2021

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counterclaims

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counterclaims; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/20/2021; Received: 05/20/2021

NOTIFICATION FROM COURT

NOTIFICATION FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 10/31/2022; Received: 10/31/2022

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 10/31/2022; Received: 10/31/2022

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Cancellation of LP

AFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Cancellation of LP; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 10/31/2022; Received: 10/31/2022

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation in Support of Cancellation of LP; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 10/31/2022; Received: 10/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 10/31/2022; Received: 10/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 10/31/2022; Received: 10/31/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTIFICATION FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/13/2022; Received: 09/13/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Counterclaims; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/20/2021; Received: 05/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Sakhizada, Q.; Filed: 05/19/2021; Received: 05/19/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - RJI; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Attempted Service - John Does; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Desiree Lecakes; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AoS - Evan Lecakes; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-F Schedule A-F to the Complaint; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.; Filed By: Falkowski, M.; Filed: 05/04/2021; Received: 05/04/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records