This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 18:52:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. MELISA LARA MENDEZ

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MELISA LARA MENDEZ. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH D CAMPBELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH D CAMPBELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MELISA LARA MENDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

SUSAN L BEXLEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

06/23/2021 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

07/07/2021 : ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

 

Docket Entries

07/07/2021

DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CAMPBELL; Location: Judge Campbell Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Case Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021

Docket(#7) Docket Type: JUDGMENT & SENTENCE FILED; Description: Instrument: 2021158461 Book: 8078 Page: 3841

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Docket Type: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021

Docket(#4) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

Docket(#3) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A3BEXUP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

Docket(#2) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A3BEXTP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

Docket(#1) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: A3BEXSP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records