This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 03/28/2023 at 02:43:39 (UTC).

JASBLEIDI RIVERA V. ALEXANDER VALENCIA

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 JASBLEIDI RIVERA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALEXANDER VALENCIA. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael Wingo and Christopher Kelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Volusia County Courthouse Deland

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Michael Wingo

Christopher Kelly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JASBLEIDI RIVERA

Respondent

ALEXANDER VALENCIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/24/2023

Docket(#18); Docket Type: FINAL ORDER / JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Description: w/att'd MSA & parenting plan Instrument: 2023061166 Book: 8385 Page: 2232 View: 2023061166

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

Docket(#17); Docket Type: ORDER APPROVING / AFFIRMING / CONFIRMING GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketSession Type: Case Management Conference; Court Officer: Michael Wingo; Location: MWZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled; Comments: or in person

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

Docket(#16); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE COMPLETION PARENTING CLASS; Description: pet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

Docket(#15); Docket Type: NOTICE / ORDER FOR CASE MGMT CONF.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

Docket(#14); Docket Type: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER/MAGISTRATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 0.00; Final Amount: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#13); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE DIST PARENTING NOTICE/STANDING ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#12); Docket Type: DISCLOSURE OF NON LAWYER FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#11); Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: Resp

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#10); Docket Type: COPY OF ID/DRIVER'S LICENSE; Description: Pet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#9); Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: Resp

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#8); Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: Resp

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#7); Docket Type: ANSWER AND WAIVER; Description: By Resp

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#6); Docket Type: NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SEC NUMBER; Description: Pet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#5); Docket Type: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Description: Pet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#4); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#3); Docket Type: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF INSOLVENCY / INDIGENCY; Description: Pet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#2); Docket Type: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#1); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records