This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/12/2023 at 19:02:44 (UTC).

ESTATE OF ROLAND A MARTIN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 ESTATE OF ROLAND A MARTIN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is James R. Clayton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

James R. Clayton

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAMANTHA MARTIN

Not Classified By Court

ROLAND A MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EDWARD A DIMAYUGA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/08/2023

FinancialQuantity: 2; Unit Amount: 1.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: -2.00; Balance: 0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: -2.00; Balance: 0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

Docket(#12); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Description: Intestate Instrument: 2023025261 Book: 8365 Page: 3931 View: 2023025261

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

Docket(#11); Docket Type: ORDER DETERMINE / DETERMINING HOMESTEAD; Description: Instrument: 2023025255 Book: 8365 Page: 3911 View: 2023025255

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

Docket(#10); Docket Type: ORDER DETERMINE / DETERMINING; Description: Exempt Property

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

Docket(#9); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Homestead

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

Docket(#8); Docket Type: WORKSHEET; Description: Summary/Intestate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

FinancialQuantity: 5; Unit Amount: 1.00; Final Amount: 5.00; Credits: -5.00; Balance: 0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

Docket(#7); Docket Type: AMENDED MOTION/PETITION/COMPLAINT OF/FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Description: Intestate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 235.00; Final Amount: 235.00; Credits: -235.00; Balance: 0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#6); Docket Type: JOINT / JOINDER OF/FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Description: by Agena Martin Landry

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#5); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#4); Docket Type: PETITION DETERMINE / DETERMINING; Description: Exempt Property

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#3); Docket Type: PETITION DETERMINE / DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#2); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH; Description: Roland A Martin (E-Filed)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

Docket(#1); Docket Type: PETITION OF/FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Description: Intestate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records