This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/20/2023 at 10:03:38 (UTC).

DENISE LENTINE, ET AL V. CYNTHIA BROOKSHIRE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 DENISE LENTINE, filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CYNTHIA BROOKSHIRE,. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Angela A. Dempsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Angela A. Dempsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DENISE LENTINE

JOSEPH LENTINE

Defendants

CYNTHIA BROOKSHIRE

PATRICK GAUTHIER

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

02/08/2023 : ORDER OF DISMISSAL

HEARING SHEET

02/07/2023 : HEARING SHEET

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION

02/06/2023 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION

RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

02/03/2023 : RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

01/31/2023 : ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

01/30/2023 : MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/25/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

01/25/2023 : RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/24/2023 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

01/17/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/17/2023 : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FIVE DAY SUMMONS

01/17/2023 : FIVE DAY SUMMONS

CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

01/17/2023 : CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/17/2023 : DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

01/17/2023 : AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

01/17/2023 : COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/17/2023 : CIVIL COVER SHEET

INFORMATION SHEET

01/17/2023 : INFORMATION SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20); Docket Type: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Description: Instrument: 2023031269 Book: 8368 Page: 3916 View: 2023031269

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketSession Type: Hearing; Court Officer: Angela A. Dempsey; Location: ADZM, Zoom Meetings; Status: Scheduled; Comments: Motion to Determine Rent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19); Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

02/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION; Description: of Diane Lavoie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17); Docket Type: RESPONSE BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: Joseph Lentine to Dfnt's Answer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16); Docket Type: ORDER OF/FOR HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15); Docket Type: MEMORANDUM BY JUDGE; Description: Set for Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Patrick Gauthier

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13); Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Cynthia Brookshire

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: PATRICK GAUTHIER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to PATRICK GAUTHIER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To PATRICK GAUTHIER fwd to VSO w/ck#6402 $80.00 for SOP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8); Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Description: complaint and summons to CYNTHIA BROOKSHIRE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7); Docket Type: FIVE DAY SUMMONS; Description: To CYNTHIA BROOKSHIRE fwd to VSO w/ck#6402 $80.00 for SOP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6); Docket Type: CONSENT BY/FOR PLAINTIFF; Description: by Denise Lentine and Joseph Lentine

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5); Docket Type: DESIGNATION OR NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Description: by Denise Lentine

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT / APPLICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE / VENUE; Description: as to Cynthia Brookshire and Patrick Gauthier

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3); Docket Type: COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION; Description: poss

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2); Docket Type: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1); Docket Type: INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records