This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 02/25/2022 at 06:23:45 (UTC).

DELAND POLICE DEPARTMENT V. ASHLEY GLORIA LAFOND

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 DELAND POLICE DEPARTMENT filed a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit against ASHLEY GLORIA LAFOND. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn Weston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn Weston

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DELAND POLICE DEPARTMENT

Respondent

ASHLEY GLORIA LAFOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DARREN ELKIND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/15/2021

Docket(#14) Docket Type: NOTICE FOR EXPIRATION OF RISK PROTECTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2021

Docket(#13) Docket Type: EVALUATION

02/18/2021

Docket(#12) Docket Type: RETURNED SUMMONS SERVED; Description: Ashley LaFond dtd 02/12/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2021

Docket(#11) Docket Type: COPY; Description: Letter to FCSO regarding service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

DocketSession Type: Risk Protection Hearing; Court Officer: Kathryn Weston; Location: 4A, DeLand; Status: Compliant; Comments: comp/final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

Docket(#10) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Description: OR for Final RPO to FL Dept of Ag, DPD & Ashely G LaFond

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE TO FL DEPT. OF AGRICULTURE ETC.; Description: by email

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

Docket(#8) Docket Type: ORDER RISK PROTECTION; Description: w/ MH Eval

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021

Docket(#7) Docket Type: HEARING SHEET

01/27/2021

Docket(#6) Docket Type: RECEIPT FIREARMS, AMMUNITION OR WEAPONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2021

Docket(#5) Docket Type: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Description: of Order Granting Petition for Temp RPO to Fl Dept of Ag, Deland PD, Ashley G LaFond

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2021

Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE TO FL DEPT. OF AGRICULTURE ETC.; Description: by email

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2021

Docket(#3) Docket Type: RETURNED ORDER / NOTICE SERVED; Description: Ashley LaFond as of 01/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2021

Docket(#2) Docket Type: ORDER TEMPORARY RISK PROTECTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2021

Docket(#1) Docket Type: PETITION FOR TEMP AND FINAL RISK PROTECTION; Description: w/affidavit in support att'd

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records