This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/26/2024 at 07:11:46 (UTC).

NIRVANA UNLIMITED LLC vs. GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 NIRVANA UNLIMITED LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURGESS, JACQUELINE

NIRVANA UNLIMITED LLC

Defendant

GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/29/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY ( V )

7/22/2019: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4307.1475 / 4604659) ( V )

8/12/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4307.1475 / 4604659) ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

6/26/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

5/29/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

5/29/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

6/24/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

7/10/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

5/29/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2019

DocketAttorney JULIA G YOUNG - Deactivated by Automated Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2019

DocketAttorney SUNNI DEGRACIA - Deactivated by Automated Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2019

DocketAttorney SUNNI DEGRACIA - Deactivated by Automated Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2019

HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom L - SC; Result: CANCELLED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4307.1475 / 4604659) ( V )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2019

DocketCASE CLOSED

08/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

08/01/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

08/01/2019

DocketMOTION HEARING SET FOR 08/13/2019 AT 10:40 AM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPRIVILEGE LOG ( V )

17 More Docket Entries
05/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

05/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

05/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

05/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

05/29/2019

DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LOW, DAVID ASSIGNED

05/29/2019

DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2019

DocketCASE FILED 05/29/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CC001381

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2019

DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000045026 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 90217682 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190529235959.TXT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records