This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 09:17:06 (UTC).

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER VS LEE, MELODY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LEE, MELODY. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GIRAUD, TONY and MICHELLE INERE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GIRAUD, TONY

MICHELLE INERE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HMA SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant

LEE, MELODY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/29/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS

11/29/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

12/14/2021:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

 

Docket Entries

03/08/2022

HearingEvent Date: 03/08/2022 14:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE ZOOM H

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022

DocketUpdate Event SC PRE TRIAL CONFER on 3/8/2022 0200 PM Judge MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE results 2/25/2022 on CANCEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022

DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

02/25/2022

DocketRECORDED SETTLEMENT STIPULATION\SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2022

DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

12/18/2021

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED MELODY LEE 12-18-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2021

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED MELODY LEE

12/14/2021

DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 3/8/2022 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING AT 2:00 PM CST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketCOMPLAINT

11/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

11/29/2021

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021044266

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $185.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

11/29/2021

DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

11/29/2021

DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

11/29/2021

DocketCASE 572021SC002802SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/29/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records