This case was last updated from Florida Pinellas Court System on 01/09/2021 at 03:16:00 (UTC).

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG Vs. ALBERTA COSTON, et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 CITY OF ST PETERSBURG filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALBERTA COSTON. This case was filed in Florida Pinellas Court System, St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit located in Pinellas, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NEWTON, CYNTHIA J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse :

    St. Petersburg Branch Office - Circuit

  • County, State:

    Pinellas, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NEWTON, CYNTHIA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF ST PETERSBURG A/AN POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

COLLINS ASSET GROUP LLC

COSTON, ALBERTA

Not Classified By Court

BURGESS, MIKE DOING BUSINESS AS INTEGRADAY INVESTMENTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MATTHEW D WEIDNER

MATTHEW D WEIDNER, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

ALVARO OROZCO

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

05/01/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/12/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

04/12/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

AGREED ORDER

03/22/2017: AGREED ORDER

CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

03/22/2017: CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE

AFFIDAVIT

03/10/2017: AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/06/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/28/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/28/2017: AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

06/14/2017: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

04/12/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

DEF RESP'S MOTION

04/10/2017: DEF-RESP'S MOTION

NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED - BUSINESS OBSERVER

03/15/2017: NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED - BUSINESS OBSERVER

AFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

03/10/2017: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

PLTF PET'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE

03/06/2017: PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE

EXHIBIT

01/25/2017: EXHIBIT

COMPLAINT

01/25/2017: COMPLAINT

COPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF DISBURSEMENT RETD BY

07/06/2017: COPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF DISBURSEMENT RETD BY PO

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/06/2017

DocketCOPY CERT OF TITLE & CERT OF DISBURSEMENT RETD BY PO; AS TO PURCHASER-REMLD 7/7/17

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2017

DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Vol./Book 19685, Page 2575, 1 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2017

DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

06/15/2017

FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; Total Financial Assessment; 549.40; Total Payments and Credits; 549.40; Balance Due 0.00; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2017-06585; MIKE BURGESS; (50.40)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2017

FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; Total Financial Assessment; 549.40; Total Payments and Credits; 549.40; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 50.40

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2017

DocketJUDICIAL ONLINE SALE; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL); REC VER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2017

DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE; MIKE BURGESS DBA INTEGRADAY INVESTMENTS INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2017

FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; Total Financial Assessment; 549.40; Total Payments and Credits; 549.40; Balance Due 0.00; REALAUCTION PAYMENT; Receipt # RA-2017-01197; Matthew Weidner; (70.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2017

FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; Total Financial Assessment; 549.40; Total Payments and Credits; 549.40; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 70.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2017

DocketPUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE

22 More Docket Entries
02/28/2017

DocketAFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS; 012717; Party: COLLINS ASSET GROUP LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2017

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; DEFAULT ENTERED; Party: COLLINS ASSET GROUP LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2017

FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; Total Financial Assessment; 549.40; Total Payments and Credits; 549.40; Balance Due 0.00; E-FILE PAYMENT; Receipt # EF-2017-03180; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; (429.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2017

FinancialPLAINTIFF; CITY OF ST PETERSBURG; Total Financial Assessment; 549.40; Total Payments and Credits; 549.40; Balance Due 0.00; Transaction Assessment; 429.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2017

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

01/25/2017

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: COSTON, ALBERTA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2017

DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; ISSUED; Party: COLLINS ASSET GROUP LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2017

DocketLIS PENDENS; Vol./Book 19497, Page 1000, 1 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2017

DocketCOMPLAINT

01/25/2017

DocketEXHIBIT; CERTIFICATE OF INDEBTEDNESS FOR SPECIAL ASSESSMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records