This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/20/2024 at 10:17:37 (UTC).

SMITH, CYNTHIA vs. SUN PUBLICATIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2008 SMITH, CYNTHIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUN PUBLICATIONS, INC. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALLER, MARGARET T and KEST, JOHN MARSHALL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALLER, MARGARET T

KEST, JOHN MARSHALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, CYNTHIA

Defendants

RUNNELS, THOMAS

SUN PUBLICATIONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYNCH, JAMES T

Defendant Attorney

SANG, ALLEN C. ESQ

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION & ORDER OF RE-ASSIGNMENT

3/1/2010: ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION & ORDER OF RE-ASSIGNMENT

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT SUN PUBLICATIONS, INC.'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/28/2010: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT SUN PUBLICATIONS, INC.'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AMENDED ORDER RESETTING PRE-TRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

7/16/2010: AMENDED ORDER RESETTING PRE-TRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

7/27/2010: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF LIEN (TC)

1/7/2011: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF LIEN (TC)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF LIEN (REC)

4/21/2011: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF LIEN (REC)

 

Docket Entries

04/21/2011

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF LIEN (REC)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2011

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF LIEN (TC)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2010

HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL; Judge: WALLER, MARGARET T; Location: COURTROOM 5D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2010

HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: WALLER, MARGARET T; Location: COURTROOM 5D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2010

DocketEntry: COURT EVENT SET EVENT: JURY TRIAL DATE: 10/25/2010 TIME: 9:15 AM JUDGE: WALLER, MARGARET T LOCATION: COURTROOM 5D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2010

DocketEntry: COURT EVENT SET EVENT: PRE-TRIAL DATE: 10/19/2010 TIME: 10:15 AM JUDGE: WALLER, MARGARET T LOCATION: COURTROOM 5D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2010

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2010

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2010

DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER RESETTING PRE-TRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2010

DocketEntry: REPORT OF MEDIATION - SETTLED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
73 More Docket Entries
11/14/2008

FinancialReceipt Number: 40005; Applied Amount: $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2008

FinancialReceipt Number: 40005; Applied Amount: $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2008

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATOREIS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2008

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2008

DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2008

DocketEntry: SUMMONS RECEIPT: 40005 DATE: 11/14/2008

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2008

DocketEntry: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING RECEIPT: 40005 DATE: 11/14/2008

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2008

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2008

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET 1 PPS (1 LACY)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2008

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

Search Court Records