This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/10/2021 at 19:21:12 (UTC).

MOORE, CAROLYN E vs. MOORE, OLIVER S

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 MOORE, CAROLYN E filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MOORE, OLIVER S. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark S Blechman and Keith F White. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************30-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Mark S Blechman

Keith F White

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAROLYN E MOORE

Respondent

OLIVER S MOORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVID SANTIAGO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2020

DocketCertificate of Delinquency Recorded

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020

DocketCertified Notice of Delinquent Support

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2020

DocketFinal Disposition Form

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2020

DocketFinal Disposition Form

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020

DocketNotice of Social Security

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020

DocketDemographic Information Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020

DocketDemographic Information Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020

DocketNotice of Need for Redirection

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2020

DocketFinal Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2020

DocketFinal Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
04/15/2020

DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2020

DocketNotice of Social Security

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2020

DocketNotice of Related Cases

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2020

DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2020

DocketCopy of Drivers License

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2020

DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2020

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2020

DocketApplication for Insolvency and Indigency For Clerk Review

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2020

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2020

DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less