This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/16/2022 at 21:19:34 (UTC).

LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian F Duckworth and Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Brian F Duckworth

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC

JOSE RAMIREZ AKA

JOSE RAMIREZ AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

FARAH MOUNT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 2/3/22 CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Order Approving Streamlined Case Management Plan

Order Approving Streamlined Case Management Plan

Joint Case Management Report

Joint Case Management Report; Comments: AGREED Case Management Plan and Order

Notice of Requirement for Case Management Plan and Order

Notice of Requirement for Case Management Plan and Order

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 2/3/22 CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability

10/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Approving Streamlined Case Management Plan

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketJoint Case Management Report; Comments: AGREED Case Management Plan and Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Requirement for Case Management Plan and Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request to Produce

03/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

03/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request to Produce

03/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

03/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
02/10/2021

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2021

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCorrespondence

02/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

02/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

02/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

02/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

02/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

02/10/2021

DocketCase Initiated

Search Court Records