This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/19/2021 at 22:38:01 (UTC).

HIRSCH, JOSEPHvs.CENTRAL FLORIDA RESTAURANTS INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 HIRSCH, JOSEPHvs CENTRAL FLORIDA RESTAURANTS INC was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Chad K Alvaro and Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse :

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Chad K Alvaro

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH HIRSCH

Defendants

TGI FRIDAYS 2632 DBA

CENTRAL FLORIDA RESTAURANTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTINA ARGUELLES

Defendant Attorneys

PETER RESTANI

SCOTT SHELTON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: 1/19/2021 AT 8:30AM

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order; Comments: EMERGENCY - EMAILED TO JA DIV. 39

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Letter

Letter

Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: and certificate of compliance

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketLetter; Comments: Re: Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Interrogatories and Request to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Cancellation of Hearing; Comments: 01/19/2021 at 8:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

01/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: 1/19/2021 AT 8:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Protective Order; Comments: EMERGENCY - EMAILED TO JA DIV. 39

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Production of Non-Party

12/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request to Produce

12/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

12/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/24/2020
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request to Produce

19 More Docket Entries
07/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

07/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2020

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Mark A. Nation; Amount: -410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2020

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

07/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

07/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

07/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

07/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

07/07/2020

DocketCase Initiated

Search Court Records