This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 02/24/2024 at 11:55:25 (UTC).

VELAZQUEZ, YAJAIRA SAHARAIT vs. VELAZQUEZ SOTO, EMMANUEL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2020 VELAZQUEZ, YAJAIRA SAHARAIT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VELAZQUEZ SOTO, EMMANUEL. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Okaloosa County Courthouse located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are STONE, WILLIAM F and MORGAN, WANDA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Okaloosa County Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Okaloosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

STONE, WILLIAM F

MORGAN, WANDA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VELAZQUEZ, YAJAIRA SAHARAIT

Respondent

VELAZQUEZ SOTO, EMMANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GREAVES, STEPHANIE N

Respondent Attorney

WHEELER, ANDREW DONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/19/2023

DocketEntry: ANSWER FILED BY RESP

11/29/2023

DocketEntry: CASE REOPENED FOR ROO

11/29/2023

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXPTEDITED TEMPORARY RELIEF ON PET'S VERIFIED PETITION TO PERMIT RELOCATION WITH MINOR CHILD (PET)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketEntry: VERIFIED PETITION TO PERMIT RELOCATION WITH MINOR CHILD (PET)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY: STEPHANIE N GREAVES ESQ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketEntry: VERIFIED OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO VERIFIED PETITION TO RELOCATE AND REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF (PET)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023

DocketEntry: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY ATTORNEY: STEPHANIE GREAVES FOR PET - SERV DATE: 4/18/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketEntry: TRANSCRIPT: OF PROCEEDINGS HELD BEFORE MAGISTRATE WANDA J MORGAN ON 3/18/2022 - MARKED AS RESP EXHIBIT A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketEntry: TRANSCRIPT: FINAL HEARING ON THE WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF HEARD BEFORE MAGISTRATE WANDA J MORGAN ON 2/22/2022 - MARKED AS RESP EXHIBIT A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketEntry: TRANSCRIPT: FINAL HEARING ON THE WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF HEARD BEFORE MAGISTRATE WANDA J MORGAN ON 11/4/2021 - MARKED AS RESP EXHIBIT A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
264 More Docket Entries
04/28/2020

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - WIFE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2020

DocketEntry: NOTICE TO FILER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2020

DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2020

DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES & REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2020

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL: FOR WIFE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2020

DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2020

DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET FILED

04/28/2020

DocketEntry: PARTIES INFORMATION SHEET FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2020

DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2020

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/28/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 DR 001242 F

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records