This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 02/27/2024 at 02:28:23 (UTC).

COX, LEIGHANNE vs. COX, WAYNE S

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 COX, LEIGHANNE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COX, WAYNE S. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Okaloosa County Courthouse located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BROWN, JOHN T and STONE, WILLIAM F. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Okaloosa County Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Okaloosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BROWN, JOHN T

STONE, WILLIAM F

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COX, LEIGHANNE

Respondent

COX, WAYNE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GILPATRICK, STEVEN J

Respondent Attorney

DLUBALA, ERICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2023

DocketEntry: CASE REOPENED FOR ROO

10/20/2023

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION/ENLARGEMENT OF TIME (RESP)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketEntry: FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE DIRECTED TO PET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntry: OBJECTION TO ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE (PET)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketEntry: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL: STEVEN GILPATRICK ON BEHALF OF PET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketEntry: ANSWER FILED BY LEIGHANNE COX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketEntry: SUMMONS SERVED: LEIGHANNE COX 9/5/203

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2023029119

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: DLUBALA, ERICA SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020 DR 003716 F, COX, LEIGHANNE VS. COX, WAYNE S ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: SIT-7/12/2023,ORFM-7/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
12/18/2020

DocketEntry: FAMILY LAW ORDERS

12/16/2020

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/16/2020

DocketEntry: PARTIES INFORMATION SHEET FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER OF: LEIGHANNE COX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketEntry: FAMILY MEDIATION INCOME VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF: LEIGHANNE COX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketEntry: JUDGE BROWN, JOHN T: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/16/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 DR 003716 F

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records