This case was last updated from Okaloosa County Courts on 02/10/2024 at 12:07:50 (UTC).

BIERLY, THOMAS EUGENE vs. BIERLY, BEAU MORGAN

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 BIERLY, THOMAS EUGENE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BIERLY, BEAU MORGAN. This case was filed in Okaloosa County Courts, Okaloosa County Courthouse located in Okaloosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLARK, LACEY POWELL, TERRELL, TERRY D, MORGAN, WANDA J and GONTAREK, JOHN JAY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Okaloosa County Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Okaloosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Okaloosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLARK, LACEY POWELL

TERRELL, TERRY D

MORGAN, WANDA J

GONTAREK, JOHN JAY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BIERLY, THOMAS EUGENE

Respondent

BIERLY, BEAU MORGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GATES, MICHAEL R

Respondent Attorney

GREAVES, STEPHANIE N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/09/2024

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: GATES, MICHAEL R SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 DR 003447 F, BIERLY, THOMAS EUGENE VS. BIERLY, BEAU MORGAN ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: ORGM-1/9/2024

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

DocketEntry: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2024

DocketEntry: CASE REOPENED FOR ROMCC

01/08/2024

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER (PET)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2024

DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2024

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FILED BY PET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

DocketEntry: MANUAL RECORDING ANNOTATIONS FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT- RECIPIENTS: GATES, MICHAEL R; GREAVES, STEPHANIE N SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 DR 003447 F, BIERLY, THOMAS EUGENE VS. BIERLY, BEAU MORGAN ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 EMAILDOCKETDESCRIPTIONS: O-11/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketEntry: ORDER OF ENFORCEMENT ON PETITIONER/HUSBAND'S MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT AND CONTEMPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketEntry: MANUAL RECORDING ANNOTATIONS FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
209 More Docket Entries
10/28/2021

DocketEntry: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF HUSBAND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketEntry: SITUS DESIGNATION FORM FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER OF: PETITIONER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketEntry: NOTICE TO FILER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

10/28/2021

DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET FILED

10/28/2021

DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketEntry: JUDGE POLSON, MARY K: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/28/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 003447 F

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records