This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/12/2024 at 06:15:35 (UTC).

WATERS MEDICAL REHAB INC VS DIRECT GEN INS CO

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 WATERS MEDICAL REHAB INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIRECT GEN INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Moore, Natalie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Moore, Natalie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Waters Medical Rehab Inc

Assignor

Hurtado, Claudia

Defendant

Direct Gen Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dover, Jeremy Phillip

Defendant Attorney

Vargas, Mauricio, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/26/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/26/2022 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

05/26/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

05/26/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

05/26/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

05/26/2022 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

05/26/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

05/26/2022 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/31/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

07/07/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Demand for Jury Trial

07/13/2022 - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Appearance

07/13/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

07/13/2022 - Email Notice:

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

07/26/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Voluntary Dismissal

08/03/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/03/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33330:2052; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Direct Gen Ins Co

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FLHCFILINGS@NGIC.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Direct Gen Ins Co

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080060AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:DOVER, JEREMY PHILLIP3920 W. BROWARD BLVDSUITE B-1FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33312COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/03/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: Direct Gen Ins Co

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040194AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:DOVER, JEREMY PHILLIP3920 W. BROWARD BLVDSUITE B-1FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33312COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/28/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP-PLEADINGS@ATTORNEYSOFTHEINJURED.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records