This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 12/19/2020 at 18:33:46 (UTC).

NEVA M WINKEL, RALPH WINKEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 NEVA M WINKEL, RALPH WINKEL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENO G ECONOMOU. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse :

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENO G ECONOMOU

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RALPH WINKEL

Decedent

NEVA M WINKEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LUBY ANIOCE MYRTHIL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/13/2020

DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2020

DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2020

DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF NEVA M. WINKEL - RECORDED INOFFICIAL RECORDS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2020

DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

07/27/2020

DocketPROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE - SENT TO PROBATE COORDINATOR 7/28/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2020

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO ADDITIONAL ACTION REQUIRED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020

FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$345.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 837372; Tender Amount: $345.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020

DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF NEVA M. WINKEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020

DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - NEVA CARTER WINKEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2020

DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2020

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2020

DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

Search Court Records