This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/07/2022 at 21:12:42 (UTC).

BAKER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.,Robinson, Quannisha vs FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 BAKER CHIROPRACTIC, INC ,Robinson, Quannisha filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAKER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

Robinson, Quannisha

Defendant

FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

XAYASONE , SOUTCHAY

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/20/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/20/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/20/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/23/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/23/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/04/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/20/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/04/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/06/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/06/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/09/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/18/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

02/18/2022

JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022095315; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAKER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2022

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAKER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order; Additional Info: Defendant: FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

08/20/2021

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAKER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAKER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAKER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: BAKER CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

Search Court Records