This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 08/06/2021 at 11:20:56 (UTC).

Michael Fahn Petitioner vs. Leslie Fahn Respondent

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Michael Fahn Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Leslie Fahn Respondent. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Alspector, Susan and Miller, Lucy Ramos. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse :

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Alspector, Susan

Magistrate

Miller, Lucy Ramos

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fahn, Michael

Respondent

Fahn, Leslie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Soto, Carmen G, ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/21/2021

DispositionFinal Judgment Dissolution of Marriage; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 117444603

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021

DispositionDisposed by Judge

06/24/2021

DocketNo Summons Issued

06/15/2021

DocketNotice of Final Hearing; for Wednesday, July 21, 2021 at 8:45 a.m

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketFamily Law Financial Affidavit; Party: Respondent Fahn, Leslie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketFamily Law Financial Affidavit; Party: Petitioner Fahn, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketNotice of Related Cases

06/04/2021

DocketAnswer & Waiver; Party: Respondent Fahn, Leslie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketMarriage Settlement Agreement

06/04/2021

DocketPetition (eFiled); HUSBAND'S VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND RELATED RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2021

DocketFamily Cover Sheet

Search Court Records