This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/18/2021 at 14:55:16 (UTC).

Kirk McAfee, et al Plaintiff vs. Florida Peninsula Ins Co Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/16/2014 Kirk McAfee, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Florida Peninsula Ins Co Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, John B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse :

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bowman, John B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

McAfee, Kirk

McAfee, Margaret

Defendants

Florida Peninsula Insurance Company

Florida Peninsula Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Struble, Matthew G

 

Court Documents

Joint Stipulation

9/21/2015 - Joint Stipulation

Mediation Report

7/27/2015 - Mediation Report

Motion to Compel

5/19/2015 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Filing

5/8/2015 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Mediation

4/23/2015 - Notice of Mediation

Notice

3/3/2015 - Notice

Notice of Interrogatories

2/24/2015 - Notice of Interrogatories

Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

2/22/2015 - Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

2/19/2015 - Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion to Transfer & Consolidate

2/2/2015 - Motion to Transfer & Consolidate

Notice of Cancellation

1/21/2015 - Notice of Cancellation

Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

1/12/2015 - Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

Response to Request for Production

12/29/2014 - Response to Request for Production

Exhibits

11/18/2014 - Exhibits

eSummons Issuance

10/28/2014 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

9/16/2014 - Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

Request for Production

9/16/2014 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatories

9/16/2014 - Notice of Interrogatories

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2015
View Court Documents

DispositionFinal Order of Dismissal; Comment (with prejudice ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 113246684

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2015
View Court Documents

DocketJoint Stipulation; JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2015
View Court Documents

DocketMediation Report; a complete settlement of all issues

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing; CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY; Party: Plaintiff McAfee, Kirk; Party: Plaintiff McAfee, Margaret

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2015
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Compel; DEPOSITION; Party: Plaintiff McAfee, Kirk; Party: Plaintiff McAfee, Margaret

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Mediation; THIRD AMENDED 07/20/15 2:30 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Mediation; April 27, 2015 @2:30 p.m

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing; CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY; Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Ins Co

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Mediation; 07/20/15 2:30PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; Kirk McAfee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
10/28/2014
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Ins Co

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

09/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Jeff Atwater, Cheif financial Officer, State of Florida, Progressive Select Insurance Co

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; Party: Plaintiff McAfee, Kirk; Party: Plaintiff McAfee, Margaret

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum; Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Ins Co

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum; Steven Coyne; Party: Defendant Florida Peninsula Ins Co

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Production; To: Florida Peninsula Insurance Company; Party: Plaintiff McAfee, Kirk; Party: Plaintiff McAfee, Margaret

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Interrogatories; To: Florida Peninsula Insurance Company; Party: Plaintiff McAfee, Kirk; Party: Plaintiff McAfee, Margaret

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: MATTHEW G STRUBLE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A126154; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MATTHEW G STRUBLE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A126154; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Search Court Records